This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 11:51:04 (UTC).

JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5398

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORRIS AN INDIVIDUAL JERRY LEE

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO. A OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTANYAN NICOLE J.

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/14/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/14/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/14/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/14/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/27/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES

5/26/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2025
  • Hearing02/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2024
  • Hearing08/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2024
  • Hearing08/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/09/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/23/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES: Status Date changed from 05/26/2023 to 05/26/2023 ; Name Extension changed from JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER to TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES ; Result Date changed from 05/26/2023 to 05/26/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED TRIAL DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2730455 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL on 02/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL as to THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JERRY LEE DORRIS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); THE KROGER CO., A OHIO CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less