This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 20:28:06 (UTC).

JERRY KULHAVY VS LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY ET

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JERRY KULHAVY against LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY ET in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8833

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KULHAVY JERRY

Defendants and Respondents

JANE DOE BUS DRIVER

DOES 1 TO 100

LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

DRIVER JANE DOE BUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NGUYEN MINH T. ESQ.

NGUYEN MINH TRI ESQ.

KLEIN MEGAN

CORWIN SCOTT JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

SWINDELLS PAMELA ANN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

11/19/2019: Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

11/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

10/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLI...)

9/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLI...)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

10/4/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WTTH PREJUDICE

8/31/2018: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WTTH PREJUDICE

Opposition - Opposition DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PR

2/5/2019: Opposition - Opposition DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PR

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

2/8/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

2/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF OF WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS

3/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF OF WAIVER OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS

DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/9/2018: DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: DEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/4/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POS1ING OF JURY FEES

6/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POS1ING OF JURY FEES

SUMMONS -

6/4/2018: SUMMONS -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Hearing06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jerry Kulhavy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketReply (TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SARA HAKAMI); Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jerry Kulhavy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerry Kulhavy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POS1ING OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708833    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On June 4, 2018, plaintiff Jerry Kulhavy (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Long Beach Public Transportation Company (“Defendant”) for injuries sustained while Plaintiff was a passenger on Defendant’s bus. Defendant moves for an order continuing trial from December 4, 2019 to June 4, 2020 to have more time to subpoena medical records and complete discovery.

Defendant first issued a subpoena to St. Mary’s Medical Center for medical records on October 23, 2018. On November 2, St. Mary’s stated it would not comply with the deposition subpoena without patient authorization. Defense counsel then attempted to meet and confer with Plaintiff’s counsel to obtain authorization. On May 24, 2019, Plaintiff’s counsel did not provide an authorization but indicated that Defendant would have to move to compel compliance. On June 6, 2019, defense counsel sent another meet and confer letter in which it offered to limit the medical records sought. Plaintiff produced limited records to Defendant, but Defendant contends it is entitled to more. Given the length of time that it took to meet and confer regarding these records, Defendant had to re-issue its subpoena and did so on September 24, 2019, which seeks compliance from St. Mary’s by October 24, 2019.

Defendant anticipates that St. Mary’s will refuse to comply with the subpoena and has reserved a hearing date of November 26, 2019. However, this hearing date is past the hearing date cut-off with a December 4, 2019 trial date. Thus, Defendant seek a continuance in order to obtain the records from St. Mary’s. Defendant also mentions that Plaintiff’s deposition is scheduled for October 11, 2019 and that issues regarding his mental health may be raised, which would necessitate a new round of discovery.

Plaintiff objects to a trial continuance on the grounds that Defendant could have brought its motion to compel compliance sooner but failed to. Plaintiff contends he will be prejudiced by a delay of his “day in court.”

This is the first continuance in the case. There is no evidence that Defendant purposefully delayed discovery, having already subpoenaed records from 30 different providers, propounded written discovery, and conducted depositions. Having found good cause, the Court GRANTS the motion. The new trial date will be June 4, 2020 and the Final Status Conference is set for May 21, 2020 with all expert, discovery, and motion cut-off dates to follow the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.