This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2022 at 11:21:30 (UTC).

JERRY G. GILMORE VS LUIS DANIEL DIAZ IBARRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 JERRY G GILMORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS DANIEL DIAZ IBARRA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0770

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILMORE JERRY G.

Defendants

DIAZ IBARRA LUIS DANIEL

DIAZ LUIS DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAVIDOW ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry G. Gilmore (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Daniel Diaz Ibarra (Defendant); Service Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 32.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jerry G. Gilmore (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Daniel Diaz (Defendant); Service Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 57.05; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry G. Gilmore (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Daniel Diaz Ibarra (Defendant); Luis Daniel Diaz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jerry G. Gilmore (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Daniel Diaz Ibarra (Defendant); Luis Daniel Diaz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry G. Gilmore (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Daniel Diaz Ibarra (Defendant); Luis Daniel Diaz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAVIDOW, ROBERT M