Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 14:12:45 (UTC).

JERRY BAPTISTE VS SIXT RENTAL CAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 JERRY BAPTISTE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIXT RENTAL CAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, ELAINE LU, SAMANTHA JESSNER and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8744

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BAPTISTE JERRY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

WIMLEY ROBERT

SIXT RENTAL CAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

IWUCHUKU DONALD ESQ.

IWUCHUKWU DONALD ENEBEIFE ESQ.

OGIKE METU CHIKEZIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER

RUWE WILLIAM EDWIN

LONG MICHAEL FRANCIS

WHITEMYER JAMES WARNER

MITCHEL ESQ STEVEN M.

RASMUSSEN PAUL D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION RE NON APPEARANCE

10/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION RE NON APPEARANCE

Notice of Ruling

10/16/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

1/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: ROBERT

11/6/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: ROBERT

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer

1/2/2019: Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/28/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANT, SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;, ETC

8/28/2018: DEFENDANT, SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;, ETC

Minute Order -

7/17/2018: Minute Order -

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF W. EDWIN RUWE

7/10/2018: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF W. EDWIN RUWE

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMIJRRER TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF W. EDWIN RUWE

7/10/2018: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMIJRRER TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF W. EDWIN RUWE

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, ETC

7/2/2018: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT ;ETC

3/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT ;ETC

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why sanctions (including monetary sanctions of at least $500) should not be imposed for failure to appear on today's date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (((1) Order to Show Cause Re: why sanctions (including monetary...) of 11/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( ((1) Order to Show Cause Re: why sanctions (including monetary...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Re Non Appearance); Filed by Sixt Rent A Car, LLC Erroneously Sued As Sixt Rental Car (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jerry Baptiste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why sanctions (including monetary sanctions of at least $500 and/or dismissal) should not be imposed for failure to cause entry of default as to all served defendants who have not responded, including Robert Wimley) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Sixt Rental Car (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerry Baptiste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. ASSAULT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIXT RENT-A-CAR LLC is a litigant