This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 05:46:23 (UTC).

JEROME SPINNER VS KAREN ALISE EVANS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 JEROME SPINNER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KAREN ALISE EVANS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3793

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

SPINNER JEROME

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

EVANS KAREN ALISE

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

EVANS KAREN ALISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK ATYRIA S

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HILTON LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF HEARING

7/28/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice of Ruling

7/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON DE...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON DE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Case Management Statement

12/31/2020: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY RESPONSE TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/19/2020: Reply - REPLY RESPONSE TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO RESPONSE TO DEMURRER

10/23/2020: Reply - REPLY TO RESPONSE TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/29/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

8/18/2020: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41(A)

8/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41(A)

Cross-Complaint

7/30/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

7/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Notice of Hearing); Filed by Karen Alise Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jerome Spinner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on De...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by Karen Alise Evans (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Karen Alise Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Karen Alise Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Karen Alise Evans (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jerome Spinner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerome Spinner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jerome Spinner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jerome Spinner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK ATYRIA S