Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 16:20:45 (UTC).

JEROME JOHNSON VS RAFAEL INACIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 JEROME JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAFAEL INACIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6423

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON JEROME

Defendants

INACIO RAFAEL

FREEDMAN DAVID

SAFETYPARK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UPTON JOHN H.

Defendant Attorney

FORRESTER KINGSLEY E

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3/9/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3/9/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SAFETYPARK CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SAFETYPARK CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer

7/28/2020: Answer

Answer

7/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Jerome Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Rafael Inacio (Defendant); SafetyPark Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE SAFETYPARK CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT); Filed by Rafael Inacio (Defendant); SafetyPark Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rafael Inacio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SafetyPark Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jerome Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jerome Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jerome Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerome Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFETYPARK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer UPTON JOHN H. ESQ.