This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:01:02 (UTC).

JEROME H SNYDER ET AL VS CLIFFORD GOLDSTEIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 JEROME H SNYDER filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CLIFFORD GOLDSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2108

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

WISE MICHAEL E.

SNYDER JEROME H.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

C. DREW PLANTING

GOLDSTEIN CLIFFORD P.

PLANTING C. DREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LETTENMAIER ARTHUR J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TAITELMAN MICHAEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES IN VIOLATION OF BUS. & PROF. CODE 17200

4/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES IN VIOLATION OF BUS. & PROF. CODE 17200

SUMMONS

4/13/2018: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/30/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/9/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/9/2018: AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES

5/29/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

8/8/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 39; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Clifford P. Goldstein (Defendant); C. Drew Planting (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jerome H. Snyder (Plaintiff); Michael E. Wise (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES IN VIOLATION OF BUS. & PROF. CODE 17200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETTENMAIER ARTHUR JAMES