This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 17:07:26 (UTC).

JEROME GUIEB, ET AL. VS DANNY LEE COOK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 JEROME GUIEB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANNY LEE COOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2274

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUIEB JEROME

Defendants

COOK DANNY LEE

MATTIVI BROTHERS LEASING INC.

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELHEAD AMELIA

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

6/30/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JADEN

7/12/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JADEN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JADEN

7/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JADEN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/16/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • Hearing06/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jerome Guieb (Plaintiff); Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jaden); Filed by Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jaden); Filed by Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jerome Guieb (Plaintiff); Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jerome Guieb (Plaintiff); Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerome Guieb (Plaintiff); Jaden Guieb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATTIVI BROTHERS LEASING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELHEAD AMELIA