This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 20:45:32 (UTC).

JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS WEST COAST STORM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST STORM, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5129

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MOORE PADILLA MICHELLE MAUREEN

SHABSIS YEVA

SALO RENATA

WEST COAST STORM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KATZ BORIS

TREYZON BORIS

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KATZ BORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

KUZDENYI ERIC A.

TREYZON BORIS

JANNER LENNY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JANNER LENNY

Cross Defendant Attorney

SZKOPEK A. MONICA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ...)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOFS OF SERVICE AND OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOFS OF SERVICE AND OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

12/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

12/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/8/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Cross-Complaint

6/1/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/20/2020: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (for the Cross-Defendants WEST COAST STORM, INC and MICHELLE MAUREEN MOORE PADILLA) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Boris Katz (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service for ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proofs of Service and of Continued Trial Setting Conference); Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Boris Katz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Boris Katz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JERMAINE FUNDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST STORM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JANNER LENNY