This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 06:13:41 (UTC).

JEREMY ZIMMER, ET AL. VS GROUP F. BUILDERS INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 JEREMY ZIMMER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GROUP F BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0309

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZIMMER JEREMY

ZIMMER MARISA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GROUP F. BUILDERS LLC

VAFAEE FARHAD ALIAS "FRANK"

GROUP F. BUILDERS INC

GAIA CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BANCROFT CONTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BIMA CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BANCROFT CONSTRUCTION INC.

E.R.R.A. BROTHERS DBA STONE CRAFTERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BARRAZA & SONS HEAVY EQUIPMENT INC.

CHRIS DOMAN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA DOMAN POOLS A CALIFORNIA CORPROATION

D & M STEEL INC.

KREIK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

SCHARFF CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

STEVE BEATTIE PAINTING

ACCENT DRYWALL CONSTRUCTION

BIMA CONSTRUCTION

WATERPROOFING SYSTEMS CORP. DBA KAZEMI & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTORS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PUGATCH ADAM NATHAN

TURNAUER BRIAN ELLIOT

HARDY SEAN MICHAEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MORROW WILLIAM DEAN

DOVE MARK STEPHEN

MILANI ANTHONY

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MILANI ANTHONY

BUBION JUSTIN

SOBEL STEVEN A

LAMARRA KEITH N.

PAZOS JAMES MANUEL

HUNTER JASON D.

PAZOS JAMES

JEFFERY MONA

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/24/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/29/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT WATERPROOFING SYSTEMS CORP. DBA KAZEMI & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTORS

9/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT WATERPROOFING SYSTEMS CORP. DBA KAZEMI & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTORS

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/25/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ACCENT DRYWALL

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ACCENT DRYWALL

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST E.R.R.A BROTHERS DBA STONE CRAFTERS

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST E.R.R.A BROTHERS DBA STONE CRAFTERS

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST BEATTIE, INC.

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST BEATTIE, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST KREIK CONSTRUCTIONS, INC.

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST KREIK CONSTRUCTIONS, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST SCHARFF CONSTRUCTION

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST SCHARFF CONSTRUCTION

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/21/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/21/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Association of Attorney

4/16/2020: Association of Attorney

Cross-Complaint

3/30/2020: Cross-Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

3/30/2020: Answer

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Bancroft Contruction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order); Filed by Group F. Builders INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER); Filed by Group F. Builders INC (Defendant); Group F. Builders LLC (Defendant); Farhad Vafaee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Bancroft Contruction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bancroft Contruction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Association of Counsel for Cross-Defendant Waterproofing Systems Corp. dba Kazemi & Associates Constructors); Filed by Waterproofing Systems Corp. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Group F. Builders INC (Defendant); Group F. Builders LLC (Defendant); Farhad Vafaee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeremy Zimmer (Plaintiff); Marisa Zimmer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.R.R.A. BROTHERS INC. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where D & M STEEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRIS DOMAN ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where GROUP F. BUILDERS INC. AKA GROUP F. BUILDERS is a litigant