This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 00:37:05 (UTC).

JEREMY TAYLOR VS CESAR ZAVALZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 JEREMY TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR ZAVALZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3345

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR JEREMY

Defendants

SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZAVALZA CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

1/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/20/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

2/5/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CESAR ZAVALZA (Defendant); SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CESAR ZAVALZA (Defendant); SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JEREMY TAYLOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW