This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 03:07:33 (UTC).

JEREMY HEINER VS DIANE CROSLEY

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 JEREMY HEINER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIANE CROSLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4950

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HEINER JEREMY

Defendants and Respondents

CROSLEY DIANE

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARCEREAU ROBERT H.

NAZIF SIED JAMES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CHALAMIDAS DEAN L.

MACDONALD SCOTT L. ESQ.

MACDONALD SCOTT LEE

CHALAMIDAS DEAN LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE) OF 02/13/2020

2/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE) OF 02/13/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

2/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; DECLARATION OF ROBERT H. MARCEREAU IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/28/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; DECLARATION OF ROBERT H. MARCEREAU IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Ruling

1/8/2020: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE DAMAGES CASE FROM LIABILITY

12/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE THE DAMAGES CASE FROM LIABILITY

Motion to Bifurcate

12/9/2019: Motion to Bifurcate

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/7/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/7/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SY NAZIF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

8/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SY NAZIF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Separate Statement

8/27/2019: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/27/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

7/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES TO PLAINTIFF JEREMY HEINER

4/6/2018: DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES TO PLAINTIFF JEREMY HEINER

DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL- BY JURY

4/6/2018: DEFENDANT DIANE CROSLEY'S - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL- BY JURY

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

4/6/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/15/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/1/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Hearing09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Diane Crosley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Jeremy Heiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jeremy Heiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jeremy Heiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Jeremy Heiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeremy Heiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694950    Hearing Date: March 18, 2021    Dept: 28

Motion to Bifurcate

The Motion to Bifurcate the Liability and Damages Phases at trial is CONTINUED to the trial date on September 16, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. to be heard and decided by the court assigned to conduct the trial of this action.  Defendant Diane Crosley may include the motion to bifurcate and any operative stipulation or opposing and reply papers with the motions in limine in the parties’ joint trial binder, pursuant to the First Amended Standing Order Re: Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, effective as of April 16, 2018, to present to the judge to whom this matter is assigned for trial.

Defendant Diane Crosley is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Defendant Diane Crosley is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

Case Number: BC694950    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 4A

Motion to Bifurcate

Defendant Motion to Bifurcate the Liability and Damages Phases at rial is CONTINUED to the trial date on February 13, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. to be heard and decided by the court assigned to conduct the trial of this action. Defendant and stipulation with the motions in limine in the parties’ joint trial binder, pursuant to the First Amended Standing Order Re: Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, effective as of April 16, 2018, to present to the judge to whom this matter is assigned for trial.

Defendant ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHALAMIDAS, DEAN L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDONALD SCOTT L. ESQ.