This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 02:44:54 (UTC).

JEREMY A. KOOIMAN VS CATHERINE WANSERSKE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 JEREMY A KOOIMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CATHERINE WANSERSKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0252

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOOIMAN JEREMY A.

Defendants

WANSERSKE KYLE A.

WANSERSKE PETER

WANSERSKE CATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEONARDO MARK

Defendant Attorney

ASH PAUL V.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

5/6/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/6/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Catherine Wanserske (Defendant); Peter Wanserske (Defendant); Kyle A. Wanserske (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Catherine Wanserske (Defendant); Peter Wanserske (Defendant); Kyle A. Wanserske (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Catherine Wanserske (Defendant); Peter Wanserske (Defendant); Kyle A. Wanserske (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeremy A. Kooiman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeremy A. Kooiman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeremy A. Kooiman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.