This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 17:51:29 (UTC).

JEREE GANT VS ALDI, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 JEREE GANT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALDI, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, LORI ANN FOURNIER, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2320

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

LORI ANN FOURNIER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GANT JEREE

LACEY-SALAS JENNIFER

Defendants

ALDI INC.

AI CALIFORNIA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AIWAZIAN EDWIN L.

GHOSH JOANNA

TAKVORYAN OVSANNA

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

NUNEZ JENNIFER R.

LI LEO Q.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

8/12/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING VERIFICATION A JUDGMENT HAS...)

8/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING VERIFICATION A JUDGMENT HAS...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DEEM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698, ET. SEQ. FILED AS

8/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DEEM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698, ET. SEQ. FILED AS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT) OF 07/18/2022

7/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT) OF 07/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING VERIFICATION A JUDGMENT HAS...)

7/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REGARDING VERIFICATION A JUDGMENT HAS...)

Notice of Continuance

7/12/2022: Notice of Continuance

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT

12/1/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: regarding verification a judgment has been entered scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: regarding verification a judgment has been entered scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Jeree Gant, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees Pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act and Plaintiff Jennifer Lacey-Salas against Defendant Aldi, Inc., an unknown business entity and Defendant AI California LLC, an unknown business entity on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jeree Gant on 12/01/2020 for a total of $0.00.Other: SEE JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT; Signed and Filed by: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff); As to: Aldi, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT: Filed By: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: regarding verification a judgment has been entered scheduled for 08/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/19/2022 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO DEEM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698, ET. SEQ. FILED AS OF DECEMBER 1, 2020, THE DATE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS: Filed By: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding verification a judgment has...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint - First Amended Complaint for Enforcement Under The Private Attorneys General Act (1st): Name Extension changed from - First Amended Complaint for Enforcement Under The Private Attorneys General Act to - First Amended Complaint for Enforcement Under The Private Attorneys General Act (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO DEEM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698, ET. SEQ. FILED AS OF DECEMBER 1, 2020, THE DATE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEYS; Signed and Filed by: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff); As to: Aldi, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Samantha Jessner; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non--Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 04/16/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff); As to: Aldi, Inc. (Defendant); AI California LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeree Gant (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 14 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******2320    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: SEC

GANT v. ALDI, INC.

CASE NO.: *******2320

HEARING 12/1/20 @ 2:30 PM

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#9

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff Gant’s unopposed motion for approval of Private Attorneys General Act Settlement and Award of PAGA Counsel Fees and costs, and settlement administrative costs is GRANTED.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Plaintiff moves for approval of PAGA settlement and for attorney’s fees and costs pursuant to Lab. Code ; 2699(a).

“The superior court shall review and approve any settlement of any civil action filed pursuant to this part." (Lab. Code ; 2699(a).)

Defendants have agreed to pay the settlement sum of $1,000,000.00, of which $350,000.00 in attorney’s fees and $15,000.00 in costs will be subtracted.

The court finds that the settlement is fair and reasonable. The settlement was derived from arm’s length negotiations before mediator David Rotman over the span of several days, and is presumptively fair. (Wershba v. Apple computer, Inc. (2001) 91 Cal.App.4th 224, 245.)

The parties have also stipulated to the filing of the proposed First Amended Complaint to add Jennifer Lacey-Salas as a party Plaintiff, whose interests are also represented in the settlement.

There is no opposition.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED.



Case Number: *******2320    Hearing Date: July 08, 2020    Dept: SEC

GANT v. ALDI, INC.

CASE NO.: *******2320

HEARING: 07/02/2020

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#3

TENTATIVE ORDER

The Status Conference re: Stay of Proceedings is CONTINUED to Wednesday, September 30, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept. SE-C pursuant to the Joint Stipulation to Lift Stay and Continue Status Conference FILED by the parties on July 2, 2020.

Plaintiff is ORDERED to give Notice.



Case Number: *******2320    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: SEC

GANT v. ALDI, INC.

CASE NO.: *******2320

HEARING: 1/7/20

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#5

TENTATIVE ORDER

The court is in receipt of the parties’ Joint Notice of Settlement, requesting that the court continue the Status Conference for 180 days. That request is GRANTED. The status conference is continued to Wednesday, July 8, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept. C.

Plaintiff to give NOTICE.