Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:59:16 (UTC).

JERALD MICHAEL DICOCHEA VS JACQUELINE DELIA DICOCHEA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 JERALD MICHAEL DICOCHEA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JACQUELINE DELIA DICOCHEA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7113

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DICOCHEA JERALD MICHEAL

DICOCHEA JOSEPH MANUEL

DICOCHEA JERALD MICHAEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DICOCHEA JACQUELINE DELIA

SAM A. MOLINA TRUSTEE OF THE IRMA CELINA TRUST

Trustee

MOLINA SAM A. OF THE IRMA CELINA TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGKVIST & BERGKVIST

Defendant Attorneys

VELASCO LAW GROUP

TREDWAY LUMSDAINE & DOYLE LLP

RAMSEY ESQ. BRIAN JACOB

VELASCO ESQ. PAUL DAVID

Cross Defendant Attorney

BERGKVIST ESQ. MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/4/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

5/4/2018: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

5/18/2018: Legacy Document

Cross-Complaint

6/11/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer

6/11/2018: Answer

Answer

6/19/2018: Answer

Legacy Document

6/19/2018: Legacy Document

Answer

7/25/2018: Answer

Answer

7/25/2018: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/1/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/2/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

11/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Order

2/13/2019: Order

Minute Order

2/19/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/29/2019: Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference); Filed by JERALD MICHEAL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff); JOSEPH MANUEL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order ORDERING PARTIES INTO THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Trial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by JERALD MICHEAL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff); JOSEPH MANUEL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by JACQUELINE DELIA DICOCHEA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JERALD MICHEAL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff); JOSEPH MANUEL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO SAM A. MOLINA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JACQUELINE DELIA DICOCHEA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JERALD MICHEAL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff); JOSEPH MANUEL DICOCHEA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASCO PAUL DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY BRIAN JACOB