This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:00:10 (UTC).

JEORJIK KHACHADOORIAN VS GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL & HEALTH

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 JEORJIK KHACHADOORIAN filed an Other lawsuit against GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1606

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

KHACHADOORIAN JEORJIK

Respondents and Defendants

DIGNITY HEALTH

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

JOAITIS SUSAN P.A.

MUSTEDANAGIC MERDINA P.A.

GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH

JOAITIS P.A. SUSAN

GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH AKA DIGNITY HEALTH

MUSTEDANAGIC P.A. MERDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

TAHMAZIAN LAW FIR P.C.

TAHMAZIAN JILBERT ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

VAZQUEZ ANDREA DAWN

LYNCH GREGORY G ESQ.

ANARI MOJAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

10/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

SUMMONS

10/31/2017: SUMMONS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration

6/12/2019: Declaration

Demand for Jury Trial

6/12/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/12/2019: Answer

Unknown

6/7/2019: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

5/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Ruling

4/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

4/12/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/21/2019: Unknown

Demand for Jury Trial

3/21/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Susan A. Jonaitis, P.A. Erroneously Sued As Susan, Joaitis P.A. (Defendant); Merdina, Mustedanagic P.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney for Defendants Merdina Mustedanagic, P.A. and Susan A. Jonaitis, P.A.); Filed by Susan A. Jonaitis, P.A. Erroneously Sued As Susan, Joaitis P.A. (Defendant); Merdina, Mustedanagic P.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Susan A. Jonaitis, P.A. Erroneously Sued As Susan, Joaitis P.A. (Defendant); Merdina, Mustedanagic P.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Susan A. Jonaitis, P.A. Erroneously Sued As Susan, Joaitis P.A. (Defendant); Merdina, Mustedanagic P.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation To File First Amended Complaint and Proposed Order (First Amended Complaint to be Filed within 10-days)); Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an Order to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Glendale Memorial Hospital and Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeorjik Khachadoorian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1606    Hearing Date: February 11, 2020    Dept: 29

Khachadoorian v. Glendale Memorial Hospital & Health

Two Motions by Defendants, Merdina Mustedanigic, P.A. and Susan Jonaitis, P.A. to Compel Plaintiff’s Responses without Objections to Defendants’ Special Interrogatories, Set Two; and Request for Production of Documents, Set Two; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED.

Plaintiff, Jeorjik Khachadoorian, is ordered to provide verified responses without objection to Special Interrogatories, Set Two and Request for Production of Documents, Set Two within 10 days. Cal Code Civil Procedure ; 2030.290, ; 2031.300.

Defendant served the foregoing discovery on 10/8/19. Ex. A to both motions. Plaintiff has not responded despite an attempt to meet and confer with Plaintiff's counsel. Ex. D to both motions.

The Court imposes total sanctions for both motions of $520.00 against Plaintiff, Jeorjik Khachadoorian, and her counsel of record, Tahmazian Law Firm, P.C., for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure ;2023.010(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANARI MOJAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAZQUEZ ANDREA DAWN