*******1874
01/15/2020
Other
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
THOMAS D. LONG
JILL FEENEY
CHA JEONG J.
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS A PUBLIC ENTITY
LOZANO AN INDIVIDUAL ENRIQUE
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY
CARPENTER JOHN CHARLES ESQ.
PONGRACZ ANDREW CHARLES ESQ.
8/22/2022: Request for Dismissal
8/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)
10/25/2021: Motion to Continue Trial Date
10/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KARI C. KADOMATSU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES
11/18/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF JEONG CHA'S LOSS OF PAST AND FUTURE EARNINGS CLAIM
11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES, FILED ...)
11/29/2021: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONDITIONAL
11/29/2021: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONDITIONAL
12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...)
12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...) OF 12/07/2021
1/14/2022: Notice of Ruling
1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)
5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)
1/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KARI C. KADOMATSU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELESS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTION
1/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELESS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATIONS OF KARI C. KADOMATSU,
2/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL
2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))
3/22/2021: Motion to Continue Trial Date
DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal with Prejudice: Name Extension: with Prejudice; As To Parties changed from County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant), County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant), Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant) to County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant), Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant), County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional as the Entire Case Filed 11/29/2021 scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2022
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by Jeong J. Cha on 01/15/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jeong J. Cha as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jeong J. Cha (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant); Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional as the Entire Case Filed 11/29/2021 scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional ...)
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional as the Entire Case Filed 11/29/2021 scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 11/02/2022 08:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional as the Entire Case Filed 11/29/2021 scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional ...)
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional as the Entire Case Filed 11/29/2021 scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/15/2022 08:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeong J. Cha (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant); Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeong J. Cha (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant); Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeong J. Cha (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles, a Public Entity (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, a Public Entity (Defendant); Enrique Lozano, an Individual (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******1874 Hearing Date: November 19, 2021 Dept: 30
Department 30, Spring Street Courthouse
November 19, 2021
*******1874
Defendant’s Motion to Continue Trial (Unopposed)
DECISION
A short continuance of a few months is not possible given the court’s congested trial calendar. If a continuance were to be granted, the new trial date would be in 2023.
Defendant has indicated that private mediation is scheduled for November 23, 2021.
The Final Status Conference is scheduled for December 15, 2021.
The Court continues this motion to December 15, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The FSC is also now set for 1:30 p.m. as well.
Moving party to provide notice.
'Case Number: *******1874 Hearing Date: May 4, 2021 Dept: 31
SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT
JEONG J. CHA, Plaintiff(s), vs. COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL., Defendant(s). | ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) | CASE NO: *******1874 [TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA Dept. 31 8:30 a.m. May 4, 2021 |
Plaintiff, Jeong J. Cha (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants, County of Los Angeles (the “County”), et al. for damages arising from a motor vehicle accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 1/15/20.
The County asserts Plaintiff is seeking loss of wages and loss of future wages in this action, so the County served a subpoena on Plaintiff’s then and current employer, Alkapura Fullerton, Inc. (“Alkapura”), for Plaintiff’s employment records.
The County asserts Alkapura did not comply with the subpoena and now moves to compel Alkapura to comply. On 4/13/21, the County filed proof of service showing personal service of the moving papers on Alkapura.
The service of a deposition notice, pursuant to CCP ; 2025.240, is effective to require any party deponent to attend, testify, and produce materials for inspection at a deposition. (CCP ; 2025.280(a).) To require the attendance and testimony of a non-party deponent, as well as his or her production of any document or tangible thing for inspection and copying, the party seeking discovery must serve on that deponent a deposition subpoena, pursuant CCP ; 2020.010, et seq. (CCP ;; 2020.010(b), 2025.280(b); See also Sears, Roebuck & Co. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh (2005) 131 Cal.App.4th 1342, 1350 [discovery from nonparties is governed by CCP ;; 2020.010, et seq., and is primarily carried out by way of subpoena].)
If a deponent fails to answer any question or to produce any document, the party seeking discovery may move the court for an order compelling that answer or production. (CCP ; 2025.480(a).) If the court determines that the answer or production sought is subject to discovery, it shall order that the answer be given or the production be made on the resumption of the deposition. (CCP ; 2025.480(i).)
In this case, the County avers the requested records are necessary to determine the nature, source, and extent of damages suffered by the Plaintiff, including his loss of wages. Additionally, the County contends Plaintiff’s prior records pertaining to the previous incident in 2014 are pertinent to assess his current claims. There has been no objection filed to the subpoena, nor has a motion to quash been filed.
The motion to compel compliance with the deposition subpoena is granted. Alkapura is ordered to produce the requested documents pursuant to the subpoenas within 20 days.
Sanctions are mandatory. (CCP ; 2025.480(j).) The County seeks sanctions in the amount of $1,110 against Alkapura. The County, however, failed to identify “every person, party, and attorney against whom the sanction is sought, and specify the type of sanction sought” in the notice of motion. (CCP ; 2023.040.) Therefore, no sanctions are imposed.
Defendant is ordered to give notice.
Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.
Dated this 4th day of May, 2021
| |
Hon. Thomas D. Long Judge of the Superior Court |
Case Number: *******1874 Hearing Date: April 16, 2021 Dept: 31
SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT
JEONG J. CHA, Plaintiff(s), vs. COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL., Defendant(s). | ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) | CASE NO: *******1874 [TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE Dept. 31 8:30 a.m. April 16, 2021 |
Plaintiff, Jeong J. Cha (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants, County of Los Angeles (the “County”), et al. for damages arising from a motor vehicle accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 1/15/20.
The County now moves to continue the current trial date of 7/14/21 for six months.
Although continuances of trials are disfavored, each request for a continuance must be considered on its own merits. (CRC Rule 3.1332(c).) The Court may grant a continuance only on an affirmative showing of good cause requiring the continuance. (CRC Rule 3.1332(c).) The Court may look to the following factors in determining whether a trial continuance is warranted: (1) proximity of the trial date; (2) whether there was any previous continuance of trial due to any party; (3) the length of the continuance requested; (4) the availability of alternative means to address the problem that gave rise to the motion; (5) the prejudice that parties or witnesses will suffer as a result of the continuance; and (6) whether trial counsel is engaged in another trial. (See generally, CRC Rule 3.1332(d)(1)-(11).) Additional factors for the Court to consider include: a party’s excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts; the proximity of the trial date; whether all parties have stipulated to a continuance; and any other fact or circumstance relevant to the fair determination of the motion or application. (CRC Rule 3.1332(c), (d).)
Here, the County avers a continuance is necessary because additional time is needed to obtain essential testimony, documents and evidence pertinent to the issues in this case. The County asserts the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic has impeded its ability to obtain all relevant discovery. Further, the County provides additional time is needed for the parties to participate in an agreed upon mediation. The motion is unopposed, and Defendant establishes good cause for the continuance.
Defendant’s motion to continue trial is granted. The 7/14/21 trial date is continued to 1/14/22 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 6/30/20 FSC is set for 1/3/22 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31. All discovery and expert cut-off dates are continued to reflect the new trial date.
Defendant is ordered to give notice.
Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.
Dated this 16th day of April, 2021
Hon. Thomas D. Long Judge of the Superior Court |