Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 23:42:14 (UTC).

JENNIFER TIFFANY VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 JENNIFER TIFFANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1985

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIFFANY JENNIFER

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

SAFEWAY INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENZE JENNIFER A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IF COMPLAINTS FILED IN POTENTIAL OF ADD-ON CASES

3/15/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IF COMPLAINTS FILED IN POTENTIAL OF ADD-ON CASES

Notice of Ruling

2/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/05/2021

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/05/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • Hearing04/26/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (if Complaints Filed in Potential of Add-On Cases); Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:11 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 02/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Tiffany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENZE, JENNIFER A