This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 01:42:14 (UTC).

JENNIFER SUNDERLAND, ET AL. VS STACY DIANE BLAUGRUND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 JENNIFER SUNDERLAND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STACY DIANE BLAUGRUND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5846

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUNDERLAND JENNIFER

FARROW JAMES

Defendants

OKLAND DEAN

OKLAND ERIK

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INTERVALLEY ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

11533 DILLING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CNA SURETY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION LICENSED AND DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

BLAUGRUND STACY DIANE

POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DORFMAN CHARLES

INTERVALLEY ESCROW INC.

CNA SURETY

11533 DILLING LLC

POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WRIGHT KIMBERLY A.

WRIGHT KIMBERLY A

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL BRANDON

REYNOSO GABRIEL Z.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER- CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION

3/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER- CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

RETURNED MAIL

6/17/2021: RETURNED MAIL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Mail

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

10/1/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANTS: STACY BL...)

10/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANTS: STACY BL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/26/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

10/28/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANTS: STACY BL...)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO DEFENDANTS: STACY BL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PROCEED WITH ARB...)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PROCEED WITH ARB...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PROCEED WITH ARBITRATION BEFORE JUDGE SCHNEGG, RET. IN FEBRUARY 2021, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, BEFORE POLIS, RET. IN MARCH OR APRIL 2021

10/8/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PROCEED WITH ARBITRATION BEFORE JUDGE SCHNEGG, RET. IN FEBRUARY 2021, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, BEFORE POLIS, RET. IN MARCH OR APRIL 2021

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/8/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

9/18/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT OKLA...)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT OKLA...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/4/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (as to defendantsStacy Blaugrund, Power Brokers International, 11533 Dilling LLC, and Charles Dorfman) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference as to defendants: Stacy Bl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER- CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION); Filed by Stacy Diane Blaugrund (Defendant); Power Brokers International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (as to defendantsStacy Blaugrund, Power Brokers International, 11533 Dilling LLC, and Charles Dorfman) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Plaintiff); James Farrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5846 Hearing Date: January 27, 2022 Dept: 72

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF

GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Date: 1/27/22 (8:30 AM)

Case: Jennifer Sunderland et al. v. Stacy Diane Blaugrund et al. (*******5846)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Power Brokers International, Inc. and Stacy Diane Blaugrund’s Unopposed Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is GRANTED. (City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1261.) The Court determines that the settlement entered by defendants Power Brokers International, Inc., Stacy Diane Blaugrund, 11533 Dilling LLC, and Charles Dorfman and plaintiffs Jennifer Sunderland and James Farrow was entered into in good faith.

Defendants Power Brokers International, Inc., Stacy Diane Blaugrund, 11533 Dilling LLC, and Charles Dorfman are discharged from all liability on claims for equitable contribution and/or full or partial indemnity by other parties, joint tortfeasors, or co-obligors, in this or any other action arising from the same general set of facts.

The Court will sign the Proposed Order Granting Defendants’ Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, electronically received 12/23/21.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Anne Wright