This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 23:29:57 (UTC).

JENNNIFER ROUSSEAU VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 JENNNIFER ROUSSEAU filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0784

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROUSSEAU JENNIFER

ROUSSEAU JENNNIFER

WOFFORD SCOTT

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SEMPRA ENERGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARRIS R. REX

CASILLAS CHRISTOPHER L.

CREED JESSE MAX

OLIVER PATRICIA KAY

PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

9/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 08/31/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Complex Determination); Filed by Jennnifer Rousseau (Plaintiff); Scott Wofford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 3:59 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 08/31/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennnifer Rousseau (Plaintiff); Scott Wofford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennnifer Rousseau (Plaintiff); Scott Wofford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia K. Oliver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASILLAS CHRISTOPHER L.