This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 01:36:10 (UTC).

JENNIFER PEREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS EVELINE J. SIRACUSE, TRUSTEE OF THE EVELINE J. SIRACUSE 2003 TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 JENNIFER PEREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against EVELINE J SIRACUSE, TRUSTEE OF THE EVELINE J SIRACUSE 2003 TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0776

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

PEREZ AN INDIVUDAL MATTHEW

PEREZ AN INDIVIDUAL JENNIFER

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY BY THROUGH OR UNDER THE NAMED CROSS-DEFENDANT

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE CROSS-COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S TITLE THERETO

ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY

EVELINE J. SIRACUSE TRUSTEE OF THE EVELINE J. SIRACUSE 2003 TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARKER CHARLES F.

KRUEGER RYAN J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITMAN SCOTT L

WHITMAN SCOTT L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Cross-Complaint

6/28/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY ACTION

6/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY ACTION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

6/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

7/22/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; ORD...)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; ORD...)

Case Management Statement

11/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/1/2021: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Cross-Defendant); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Related Case Determination of 19 GDCV00522 filed on 05/02/2019 Glendale Courthouse-Dept E) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Ord...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiffs' Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Plaintiff); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Cross-Defendant); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Related Case); Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency Action); Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Eveline J. Siracuse, Trustee of the Eveline J. Siracuse 2003 Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Plaintiff); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Plaintiff); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Plaintiff); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Perez, an Individual (Plaintiff); Matthew Perez, an Indivudal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKER CHARLES F. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUEGER RYAN JAMES