This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 02:37:18 (UTC).

JENNIFER PADDA VS WILLIAM JAMESON, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 JENNIFER PADDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM JAMESON, JR ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MONICA BACHNER and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6951

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MONICA BACHNER

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PADDA JENNIFER

Defendants

JAMESON WILLIAM JR.

SEPULVEDA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SEPULVEDA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

Defendant Attorney

KING ALLEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/1/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, SEPULVEDA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, TO STRIKE...)

4/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, SEPULVEDA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, TO STRIKE...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/13/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2023

3/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY...)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

2/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/30/2022

11/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/30/2022

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

10/7/2022: Cross-Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer: Filed By: Sepulveda Property Management (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/28/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Motion of Defendant, Sepulveda Property Management, to Strike...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike Complaint scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 71 - Hon. Daniel M. Crowleyeffective 04/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Sepulveda Property Management (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Sepulveda Property Management, an entity to Sepulveda Property Management

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant); Sepulveda Property Management, an entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Monica Bachner in Department 71 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6951 Hearing Date: April 28, 2023 Dept: 71

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

DEPARTMENT 71

TENTATIVE RULING

JENNIFER PADDA,

vs.

WILLIAM JAMESON, JR., et al.

Case No.: *******6951

Hearing Date: April 28, 2023

Defendant Sepulveda Property Management’s motion to strike Plaintiff Jennifer Padda’s claims for punitive damages in her complaint is GRANTED.

Defendant Sepulveda Property Management (“SPM”) (“Defendant”) moves to strike portions of Plaintiff Jennifer Padda’s (“Padda”) (“Plaintiff”) complaint (“Complaint”), specifically the claim for punitive damages in the 2nd, 3rd, 5th, and 9th causes of action. (Notice of Motion, pg. 1.) Defendant also requests that the complaint be corrected throughout to reflect that there is only one Plaintiff, Plaintiff Padda. (Notice of Motion, pg. 1.) Defendant’s motion is made on the grounds that the requisite elements for punitive damages are not properly pled. (Notice of Motion, pg. 1.)

Defendant filed the instant motion on September 26, 2022. Plaintiff filed her opposition on March 2, 2023. As of the date of this hearing, Defendant has not filed a reply.

Motion to Strike

C.C.P. 436 provides that the Court may, upon a motion made pursuant to C.C.P. 435, or at any time within its discretion and upon terms it deems proper, “strike out any irrelevant, false, or improper matter inserted in any pleading.” (C.C.P. 436(a).)

Punitive Damages

Punitive damages may be recovered upon a proper showing of malice, fraud, or oppression. (Civ. Code 3294(a).) “Malice” is defined as conduct intended to cause injury to a person or despicable conduct carried on with a willful and conscious disregard for the rights or safety of others. (Turman v. Turning Point of Central California, Inc. (2010) 191 Cal.App.4th 53, 63.) “Oppression” means despicable conduct subjecting a person to cruel and unjust hardship, in conscious disregard of the person’s rights. (Id.) “Fraud” is an intentional misrepresentation, deceit, or concealment of a material fact known by defendant, with intent to deprive a person of property, rights or otherwise cause injury. (Id.) Conclusory allegations, devoid of any factual assertions, are insufficient to support a conclusion that parties acted with oppression, fraud, or malice. (Smith v. Superior Court (1992) 10 Cal.App.4th 1033, 1042.)

While Plaintiff pleads causes of action for tortious breach of warranty of habitability, nuisance, negligence and negligence per se, intentional influence to vacate, and intentional infliction of emotional distress and specific facts alleged to support allegations of oppression, fraud, or malice in the 2nd, 3rd, and 5th causes of action. (Complaint 28-35, 59-63, 69-71, 123), the allegations are conclusory and are void of the specific factual allegations required to establish an intent to injure the plaintiff or a despicable and willful disregard of her safety. (College Hospital Inc. v. Superior Court (1994) 8 Cal.4th 704, 725.)

Accordingly, Defendant’s motion to strike Plaintiff’s request for punitive damages from her Complaint is GRANTED. Paragraphs 96, 105, 123, and 157 are stricken from the Complaint. In addition, all references to “Plaintiffs” or “Plaintiffs’” are stricken. Plaintiff has 30 days leave to amend.

Dated: April , 2023

Hon. Daniel M. Crowley

Judge of the Superior Court