This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 10:51:25 (UTC).

JENNIFER PADDA VS WILLIAM JAMESON, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 JENNIFER PADDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM JAMESON, JR ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6951

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PADDA JENNIFER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JAMESON WILLIAM JR.

SEPULVEDA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KING ALLEN ROBERT

Cross Defendant Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY...)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

2/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/30/2022

11/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/30/2022

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

10/7/2022: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

9/26/2022: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Complaint

8/19/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (7-10 Day Estimate) scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference Order to Show Cause Regarding Why...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why $500 Sanctions Should not be Imposed for Plaintiff's Counsel's Failure to Appear on January 18, 2023 scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 updated: Result Date to 03/06/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why $500 Sanctions Should not be Imposed for Defendant's Counsel's Failure to Appear on January 18, 2023 and Failure to File a Case Management Statement scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 updated: Result Date to 03/06/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Sepulveda Property Management (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Sepulveda Property Management, an entity to Sepulveda Property Management

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant); Sepulveda Property Management, an entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jennifer Padda (Plaintiff); As to: William Jameson, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Monica Bachner in Department 71 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less