This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 22:56:38 (UTC).

JENNIFER MOORE VS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 JENNIFER MOORE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8665

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MOORE JENNIFER

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL INC.

WOOD RANCH VALENCIA L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SANTIAGO & JONES

JONES DAVID G

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

RAINES FELDMAN LLP

SCHROEDER BETH A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/24/2018: DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

ORDER RE DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, LP.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPFL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/31/2018: ORDER RE DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, LP.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPFL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

8/31/2018: RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order -

8/31/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice of Settlement

2/21/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/21/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

4/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

Notice of Ruling

4/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/12/2018: DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF BRITNI FALTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORA

7/12/2018: DECLARATION OF BRITNI FALTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WOOD RANCH BARBEQUE AND GRILL, INC. AND WOOD RANCH VALENCIA, L.P.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order -

6/15/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

6/7/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Wood Ranch Barbeque and Grill, Inc. (Defendant); Wood Ranch Valencia, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((entire action)); Filed by Jennifer Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jennifer Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jennifer Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. AGE DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT (COY. CODE, 12940(A)) ETC....

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wood Ranch Barbecue & Grill Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROEDER BETH ACKERMAN