This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 12:59:49 (UTC).

JENNIFER MICHELE FULLER, ET AL. VS JORGE LUIZ ZARAGOZA-ESPARZA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 JENNIFER MICHELE FULLER, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE LUIZ ZARAGOZA-ESPARZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0596

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FULLER JENNIFER MICHELE

GRAVES LUCAS KENNETH

Defendant

ZARAGOZA-ESPARZA JORGE LUIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELLOSO DULCE C.

CHAMPION KIA S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/17/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/17/2023: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/19/2023

5/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/19/2023

Notice of Settlement

8/3/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/4/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/4/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

8/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jennifer Michele Fuller, et al. on 03/17/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jennifer Michele Fuller and Lucas Kenneth Graves as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff); Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff); Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff),Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 08/29/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff), Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff) to Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff), Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Filed By: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff),Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 08/04/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for plaintiff's failure to appear on 5-19-23 and failing to serve this matter on named defendants scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff); Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luiz Zaragoza-Esparza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff); Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luiz Zaragoza-Esparza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jennifer Michele Fuller (Plaintiff); Lucas Kenneth Graves (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Luiz Zaragoza-Esparza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less