This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 10:42:51 (UTC).

JENNIFER MARTINEZ VS SMART & FINAL STORES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 JENNIFER MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8277

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ JENNIFER

Defendants

SMART & FINAL LLC

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONG JOOHAN SONG

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/6/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/1/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/1/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/17/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Hearing06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((AMENDED)); Filed by Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLANCEY CLIFFORD A