This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:42:29 (UTC).

JENNIFER L LOVE VS HUGO W OSORIO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 JENNIFER L LOVE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUGO W OSORIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7329

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOVE JENNIFER L.

Defendants

OSORIO HUGO W.

TENSION SUNCOAST POST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WACKER TED B. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BLAKE KIMBERLY A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/8/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

3/8/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service

4/10/2018: Proof of Service

DEFENDANTS SUNCOAST POSTTENSION, LTD. AND HUGO W. OSORIO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/9/2018: DEFENDANTS SUNCOAST POSTTENSION, LTD. AND HUGO W. OSORIO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jennifer L. Love (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hugo W. Osorio (Defendant); Suncoast Post Tension (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hugo W. Osorio (Defendant); Suncoast Post Tension (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS SUNCOAST POSTTENSION, LTD. AND HUGO W. OSORIO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jennifer L. Love (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer L. Love (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKE KIMBERLY A.