This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 00:06:06 (UTC).

JENNIFER KENT VS TERRY GEE LEW ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 a Other case was filed by JENNIFER KENT against TERRY GEE LEW in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5995

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JOSEPH R. KALIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

KENT JENNIFER

Defendants and Respondents

LEW SUE MON TOY

DOES 1 TO 20

LEW SUE TOY

LEW YING FONG

LEW TERRY GEE

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

LEW SUE TOY

LEW TERRY GEE

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/26/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE UNVERIFIED ANSWER OFF CALENDAR

9/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE UNVERIFIED ANSWER OFF CALENDAR

Notice

11/20/2018: Notice

Answer

11/7/2018: Answer

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS YTNG FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW, A.K.A. SUE MON TOY LEW TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/12/2018: VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS YTNG FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW, A.K.A. SUE MON TOY LEW TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNVERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS YING FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW; ETC

8/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNVERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS YING FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW; ETC

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF SARAH M. BARNES RE: MOTION TO STRIKE MEET AND CONFER (CODE CIV. PROC., 435.5)

8/2/2018: DECLARATION OF SARAH M. BARNES RE: MOTION TO STRIKE MEET AND CONFER (CODE CIV. PROC., 435.5)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

YING FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW, A.K.A. DUE MON TOY LEWS' CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST TERRY GEE LEW AND ROES 1-10 FOR PARTITITON

7/20/2018: YING FONG LEW AND SUE TOY LEW, A.K.A. DUE MON TOY LEWS' CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST TERRY GEE LEW AND ROES 1-10 FOR PARTITITON

Unknown

7/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/25/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER TOS HOW CAUSE HEARING

5/14/2018: ORDER TOS HOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice (name extension) (of Status Conference re: Settlement); Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Terry Gee Lew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • ORDER TOS HOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE AND COLLECT MONEY DUE ON MEDI-CAL CREDITOR'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705995    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: November 8, 2019

Case Name: Kent v. Lew, et al.

Case No.: BC705995

Motion: Motion to Enforce Settlement

Moving Party: Plaintiff Jennifer Kent, Director of the Dept. of Health Care Services

Responding Party: Unopposed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted.

Plaintiff Jennifer Kent, Director of the Dept. of Health Care Services, seeks to enforce the parties’ June 19, 2019, settlement.

The Court is authorized to enter judgment pursuant to the stipulated settlement. (Code Civ. Proc., § 664.6.) In reviewing a motion to enforce a settlement, the Court determines “whether the parties entered into a valid and binding settlement.” (Hines v. Lukes (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 1174, 1182.) “A settlement is enforceable under section 664.6 only if the parties agreed to all material settlement terms. [Citations.] The court ruling on the motion may consider the parties’ declarations and other evidence in deciding what terms the parties agreed to, and the court’s factual findings in this regard are reviewed under the substantial evidence standard. [Citations.] If the court determines that the parties entered into an enforceable settlement, it should grant the motion and enter a formal judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement.” (Id. at pp. 1182-1183; see also Osumi v. Sutton (2007) 151 Cal.App.4th 1355, 1357 [“Strong public policy in favor of the settlement of civil cases gives the trial court, which approves the settlement, the power to enforce it”].)

Plaintiff has met her burden to show that (1) the parties agreed to settle this matter pursuant to the terms set forth in their June 19, 2019, settlement agreement (Barnes Decl. ¶ 5, Exhibit 2), and (2) the Court retains jurisdiction per Code Civ. Proc. § 664.6 (Barnes Decl., Exhibits 1-2.) Accordingly, the Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted. The Court will enter judgment ordering Terry Gee Lew to do all things necessary and to execute all documents necessary to consummate the sale by Ying Fong Lew and Sue Toy Lew of the real property located at 930 New Depot Street, Los Angeles, California 90012.