This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:30:52 (UTC).

JENNIFER KENT VS SERGIO ALVAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 JENNIFER KENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGIO ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3340

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KENT JENNIFER

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ALVAREZ SERGIO

LAYFIELD & WALLACE APC

ALVAREZ SERGIO RODRIGUEZ

WALLACE BRADLEY S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BURNS JANET E. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/22/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

4/20/2018: NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/26/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY ACTION

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY ACTION

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jennifer Kent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE AND COLLECT MONEY DUE ON MEDI-CAL CREDITOR'S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LAYFIELD LAW FIRM APC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS JANET ELINOR