Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 09:53:16 (UTC).

JENNIFER GWASDA VS EDWARD HAERING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 JENNIFER GWASDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDWARD HAERING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1620

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWASDA JENNIFER

Defendants

HAERING EDWARD

HERTZ

HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS

RAISER-CA LLC

RASIER LLC

ROSALES SONIA MARICELA

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2024
  • Hearing06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JENNIFER GWASDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JENNIFER GWASDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JENNIFER GWASDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant