This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:17:47 (UTC).

JENNIFER FRANCO VS AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by JENNIFER FRANCO against AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0331

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FRANCO JENNIFER

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

BARAJAS NICHOLAS

AMR

DOES 1 TO 100

BROWN DREW

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

4/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/27/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Ruling

7/2/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

7/2/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

1/16/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by American Medical Response (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by American Medical Response (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Jennifer Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jennifer Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690331    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JENNIFER FRANCO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC690331

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 2, 2019

Plaintiff, Jennifer Franco filed this action against Defendants, American Medical Response, Drew Brown, and Nicholas Barajas for damages arising out of an alleged sexual assault by Brown and Barajas while working for AMR. Plaintiff filed her original complaint on 1/16/18. Plaintiff did not file proof of service of the summons and complaint on AMR until 4/29/19. AMR filed a demurrer to the complaint on 6/27/19, which resulted in Plaintiff filing a First Amended Complaint on 7/16/19. AMR filed an answer to the complaint on 9/03/19. To date, Plaintiff has not filed proof of service of the summons and complaint on Brown or Barajas.

At this time, AMR moves to continue trial. It correctly notes that it only recently appeared in the case after a long delay in being served, that it has had insufficient time to conduct discovery, and that it needs time to review the case and consider settlement options. As noted above, AMR filed its answer to the complaint on 9/03/19, only five months prior to the currently scheduled trial date.

The Court finds Defendant’s very recent addition to the case constitutes good cause for a continuance of the trial date. The Court finds the request for a nine-month continuance reasonable, as this will result in a trial date approximately twelve months after Defendant answered the FAC.

The 1/03/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Friday, 9/25/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 1/16/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to 9/11/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. The OSC re: dismissal of the remaining defendants for failure to serve and failure to prosecute remains on calendar for 1/16/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. All discovery cut-off deadlines are continued to reflect the new trial date.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.