This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2020 at 00:26:01 (UTC).

JENNIFER BOWEN ET AL VS KELSEY CHIEMI FONG ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 JENNIFER BOWEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KELSEY CHIEMI FONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2240

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWEN JENNIFER

GEORGITIS ANASTASIA CHLAIR

GEORGITIS JARED

GEORGITIS BRONWYNN KERRY

Claimants

MARISCAL MARTY

CHENG DIANA

Defendants

FONG OSCAR

HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF 4301 LOS FELIZ

FONG JOYCE AKA JOYCE OSHIRO

FONG KELSEY CHIEMI AKA KELSEY OSHIRO AKA KELSEY NARAHARA AKA KELSEY HARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALBERTS JEREMY JON

Defendant Attorneys

NORA SAMUEL R. ESQ.

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY ESQ.

NESS TIMOTHY M.

SAADIAN MELODY Z

NOH JONATHAN D.

ERSOFF VICTORIA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

6/7/2019: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/7/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

6/7/2019: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

8/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); STATUS CONFER...)

8/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); STATUS CONFER...)

Substitution of Attorney

8/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/28/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRONWYNN

10/24/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRONWYNN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANASTASIA

11/15/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANASTASIA

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING GUARDIAN AD LITEM(ANASTSIO)

11/21/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING GUARDIAN AD LITEM(ANASTSIO)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/21/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

2/14/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

2/14/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • Hearing09/08/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Distribution of Minor Plaintiffs' Net Proceeds to Pay Liens); Filed by Jennifer Bowen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Advanced and Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Kelsey Chiemi Fong (Defendant); Kelsey Oshiro (Defendant); Kelsey Narahara (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS KELSEY CHIEMI FONG, OSCAR FONG AND JOYCE FONG TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kelsey Chiemi Fong (Defendant); Oscar Fong (Defendant); Joyce Fong (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) CONSTRUCTIVE EVICTION (INTENTIONAL TORT); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Bowen (Plaintiff); Jared Georgitis (Plaintiff); Bronwynn Kerry Georgitis (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2240    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 26

Bowen et al. v. Fong et al., ****2240

The Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on behalf of Claimant Anastasia Chlair Georgitis filed on February 14, 2020 is incomplete. Petitioner has failed to file an Order Approving Compromise on form MC-351. Prior to 12 noon on March 11, 2020, Petitioner must file and serve a fully completed proposed Order Approving Compromise on form MC-351 and deliver a courtesy copy directly to Department 26. Otherwise, the petition will be denied without prejudice.



Case Number: ****2240    Hearing Date: March 12, 2020    Dept: 26

Bowen et al. v. Fong et al., ****2240

The Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on behalf of Claimant Bronwynn Kerry Georgitis filed on February 14, 2020 is incomplete. Petitioner has failed to file an Order Approving Compromise on form MC-351. Prior to 12 noon on March 11, 2020, Petitioner must file and serve a fully completed proposed Order Approving Compromise on form MC-351 and deliver a courtesy copy directly to Department 26. Otherwise, the petition will be denied without prejudice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOA PREMIER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOH JONATHAN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NESS TIMOTHY N. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERSOFF VICTORIA L