This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 15:40:17 (UTC).

JENNIFER ANN STARR VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 JENNIFER ANN STARR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3074

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARR JENNIFER ANN

Defendant

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVIRAM ROY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2024
  • Hearing11/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Ann Starr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Ann Starr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Ann Starr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant