This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 13:31:30 (UTC).

JENNIFER ALBERTO VS ALINE BUGARIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 JENNIFER ALBERTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALINE BUGARIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7372

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBERTO JENNIFER

Defendants

AMAZON LOGISTICS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BUGARIN ALINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IRVIN CHAD ERIC

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2024
  • Hearing10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Alberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennifer Alberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennifer Alberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Irvin, Chad