This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 07:05:22 (UTC).

JENNIE STABILE VS SOLIMAN SHEHATA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 JENNIE STABILE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLIMAN SHEHATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1107

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STABILE JENNIE

Defendants

ROBSON ELIZABETH DBA JJ'S CLEANERS

SHEHATA SOLIMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Hearing01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jennie Stabile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennie Stabile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jennie Stabile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMER STEVEN