This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 12:37:09 (UTC).

JENNA AMAYA VS CINDY GALVEZ LACY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 JENNA AMAYA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CINDY GALVEZ LACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1505

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMAYA JENNA

Defendants and Respondents

LACY CINDY GALVEZ

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

MOSCATEL ABBY JANE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

8/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 08/17/2020

8/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 08/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

12/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES

11/12/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/8/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A MENTAL EXAMINATION HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

7/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A MENTAL EXAMINATION HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

8/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

NOTICE OF REJECTION PLEADINGS

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION PLEADINGS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CINDY GALVEZ LACY; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

5/29/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CINDY GALVEZ LACY; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

SUMMONS -

4/10/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/10/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Hearing02/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:26 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...) of 08/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cindy Galvez Lacy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Cindy Galvez Lacy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CINDY GALVEZ LACY; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jenna Amaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jenna Amaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701505    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JENNA AMAYA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CINDY GALVEZ LACY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC701505

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 12, 2019

Plaintiff, Jenna Amaya filed this action against Defendant, Cindy Galvez Lacy for wrongful death arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed the action on 4/10/18.  Trial was originally scheduled for 10/10/19.  On 8/22/19, the Court granted the parties’ stipulation to continue the trial from 10/10/19 to 2/19/20. 

At this time, Defendant moves to continue the trial date for approximately seven months, contending Defense Counsel is scheduled to give birth on or about the time of the scheduled trial date, and will be on maternity leave for five months thereafter.  Notably, all parties stipulate to the requested continuance.    

The Court finds Defendant’s attorney’s maternity leave sufficient to support a trial continuance in the duration sought.  In the absence of opposition (indeed, as noted above, Plaintiff has expressly stipulated to the relief sought), the motion to continue trial is granted. 

The 2/19/20 trial is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 9/15/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The 2/06/20 FSC is advanced to today’s date and continued to 9/01/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3.  All discovery and expert cut-off dates are continued to reflect the new trial date.

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.