Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 16:55:55 (UTC).

JENIFER J PYTKO ET AL VS CYRIL VIGUIER ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 JENIFER J PYTKO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CYRIL VIGUIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. SEIGLE, ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE, MICHAEL L. STERN, ANTHONY MOHR and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4033

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

MICHAEL L. STERN

ANTHONY MOHR

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

PYTKO JENIFER J.

PYTKO JESSICA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

TIBOLD ASSET MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 40

PARTNERS TRUST REAL ESTATE BROKERAGE &

VIGUIER CYRIL

VIGUIER ISABEL

DRYMASTER RESTORATION DOE 3

AMBIENTE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CORP. DOE 2

SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION [DOE 1]

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VIGUIER CYRIL

VIGUIER ISABEL

DRYMASTER RESTORATION DOE 3

AMBIENTE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CORP. DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BALABAN DANIEL K. ESQ.

BALABAN DANIEL KEITH ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY J. CARPENTER

GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA LLP

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

DOMINGUEZ DARIN

CARPENTER GREGORY JAMES

ROBERTS JASON SKOCZULEK

BERGSTEN ROBERT

DOLAN ROBERT T.

DOLAN ROBERT TRACEY

GROSFELD ROBERT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GREGORY J. CARPENTER

GRANT GENOVESE & BARATTA LLP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTS JASON SKOCZULEK

BERGSTEN ROBERT

GROSFELD ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/17/2019: Answer

Answer

10/17/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS 1. CROSS-COMPLAINANT ISABEL VIG...) OF 09/11/2019

9/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS 1. CROSS-COMPLAINANT ISABEL VIG...) OF 09/11/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (RES ...)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (RES ...)

Case Management Statement

7/24/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Brief - BRIEF RE: WITHDRAWAL OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

6/5/2019: Brief - BRIEF RE: WITHDRAWAL OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT AMBIENTE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CORP.'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICAL OFFICER UNDER CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6

5/7/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT AMBIENTE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CORP.'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICAL OFFICER UNDER CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/2/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TYLER M. ROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIBOLD'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

5/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TYLER M. ROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIBOLD'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMBIENTE CONSTRUCITON & DESIGN CORP'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEC OF VANESS L. LOFTUS-BREWER

3/11/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMBIENTE CONSTRUCITON & DESIGN CORP'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEC OF VANESS L. LOFTUS-BREWER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

4/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/2/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/5/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

147 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER); Filed by Jenifer J. Pytko (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Jury Trial (estimated 10 days) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF THE COURT?S NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER); Filed by Jenifer J. Pytko (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order to Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Ambiente Construction & Design Corp. DOE 2 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
218 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Jenifer J. Pytko (Plaintiff); Jessica Pytko (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. INTENTIONAL NFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jenifer J. Pytko (Plaintiff); Jessica Pytko (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC654033    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 73

9/10/2020

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

JENIFER J. PYTKO, et al. v. CYRIL VIGUIER, et al. (BC654033)

Counsel for Defendant/moving party Everlast Building Construction, Inc. dba Drymaster Restoration: Robert Bergsten, Benjamin Goldstein (Hosp, Gilbert & Bergsten)

Other counsel: Omitted.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT (filed 8/3/2020)

TENTATIVE RULING

The motion is granted.

Discussion

The unopposed motion (filed 8/3/2020) for leave to file a cross-complaint against Cyril Vigieur and Ambiente Construction and Design Corp. is GRANTED. CCP §§ 426.50; 473(a); 576. The cross-complaint attached as Exhibit A to the motion is deemed filed and served on all previously served and appearing parties as indicated on the proof of service of the motion. Moving party must file a stand-alone original pleading within 5 days. Cross-defendants must file a responsive pleading within 15 days.  If any cross-defendant fails to do so, cross-complainants must request entry of default within 30 days thereafter.  The court sets a non-appearance date for status of the cross-complaint in 60 days:  _____________. Notice of ruling by moving party.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORRENTO BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION [DOE 1] is a litigant

Latest cases where TIBOLD ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where S3 & E REAL ESTATE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS JASON SKOCZULEK