This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 04:28:09 (UTC).

JENICA GOLD VS PERFECT 85 DEGREES C, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 JENICA GOLD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PERFECT 85 DEGREES C, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7996

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLD JENICA

Defendants

PERFECT 85 DEGREES C INC. DBA 85 C BAKERY CAFE

GARCIA RAUL AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHARMA POOJA K.

DESIMONE V. JAMES ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

YU JASON T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON YU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON YU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHARLES WU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHARLES WU IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/3/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAUL GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAUL GARCIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Statement of the Case

9/3/2021: Statement of the Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY MORONES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY MORONES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service by Mail

9/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Settlement

10/6/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2021

10/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2021

Proof of Service by Mail

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE AND PROPOSED ORDER

12/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS OF ENABLERS ANONYMOUS GROUP/CODA SUPPORT GROUP

2/10/2021: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS OF ENABLERS ANONYMOUS GROUP/CODA SUPPORT GROUP

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF V. JAMES DESIMONE, ESQ. REGARDING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFAULT

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF V. JAMES DESIMONE, ESQ. REGARDING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFAULT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

5/3/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docketat 3:56 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Perfect 85 Degrees C, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Perfect 85 Degrees C, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Garcia, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF PATRICIA BRUM PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5 FOR AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT); Filed by Perfect 85 Degrees C, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Garcia, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jenica Gold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less