This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 00:22:02 (UTC).

JENET MILLS-WALDEN VS HK AUTOMOTIVE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 JENET MILLS-WALDEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HK AUTOMOTIVE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8219

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MILLS-WALDEN JENET

Respondents and Defendants

MECHANICS BANK

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HOOMA HYUNDAI

HK AUTOMOTIVE INC.

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC.

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. (DOE 21)

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 61)

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 1)

NISSANI HOOMAN (DOE 42)

NISSANI BROTHERS HYUNDAI (DOE 43)

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 21)

NISSANI BROTHERS HYUNDAI (DOE 84)

RHH AUTOMOTIVE INC. (DOE 4)

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 81)

NISSANI HOOMAN (DOE 82)

NISSANI BROTHERS HYUNDAI (DOE 83)

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. (DOE 41)

NISSANI BROTHERS HYUNDAI (DOE 44)

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MOBASSERI ROBERT B. ESQ.

MOBASSERI ROBERT B ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MCCREARY DUNCAN ESQ.

SALAMIRAD ALI

SHOECRAFT DEVIN

MCCREARY DUNCAN JAMES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

Order

2/27/2019: Order

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Application

1/18/2019: Application

Association of Attorney

1/14/2019: Association of Attorney

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/30/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

11/7/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT HK AUTOMATIVE, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/31/2017: DEFENDANT HK AUTOMATIVE, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT MECHANICS BANK'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/31/2017: DEFENDANT MECHANICS BANK'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRevivorship of HK and Trial Setting Conference are/) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Revivorship of HK and Trial Setting Con...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: ((examination of tax documents)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Hooman Nissani in response to Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by HK Automotive, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jenet Mills-Walden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jenet Mills-Walden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by International Fidelity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jenet Mills-Walden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT, CIVIL CODE SECTIONS 1790 ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jenet Mills-Walden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSANI BROTHERS HYUNDAI (DOE 43) is a litigant

Latest cases where HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 61) is a litigant

Latest cases where HK AUTOMOTIVE INC. DBA HOOMAN HYUNDAI is a litigant

Latest cases where HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant