This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 01:48:44 (UTC).

JENDO ERMI, LP VS SUPER HK OF EL MONTE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 JENDO ERMI, LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SUPER HK OF EL MONTE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1080

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENDO ERMI LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONON JOHANNA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

5/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/07/2020

5/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 03/23/2020

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/19/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/19/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Mail

12/19/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/4/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SUPER HK OF EL MONTE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

12/4/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SUPER HK OF EL MONTE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/2/2019: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Super HK of El Monte, Inc., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jendo Ermi, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant