This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 12:28:29 (UTC).

JELLETICH, JONI VS JELLETICH, BRECK

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 JELLETICH, JONI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JELLETICH, BRECK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0842

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JELLETICH JONI

Respondent

JELLETICH BRECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CRAMPTON ELISABETH CELESTE

CAMAUR ELISABETH CELESTE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Default FL170

1/24/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

3/1/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

3/1/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Judgment

3/1/2022: Judgment

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

3/22/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Proof of Service of Summons - by Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - by Personal Service

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

11/2/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

11/2/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

Request - Enter Default FL165

11/23/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

10/25/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Inc.; No Valid P.O.S.

10/13/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Inc.; No Valid P.O.S.

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Inc.; No Valid P.O.S.

10/13/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Inc.; No Valid P.O.S.

Minute Order

9/29/2021: Minute Order

Request - Enter Default FL165

8/31/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Request - Enter Default FL165

8/31/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

8/19/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/26/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (426 REVIEW ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by Personal Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Defective- Item #3a Incomplete ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Fiduciary Duties ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Litigation Hold ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAMPTON ELISABETH CELESTE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMAUR ELISABETH CELESTE