This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 23:17:20 (UTC).

JELD-WEN INC DBA AMERICAN BUILDING SUPPLY A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS RETROLOCK CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 JELD-WEN INC DBA AMERICAN BUILDING SUPPLY A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RETROLOCK CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0502

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JELD-WEN INC DBA AMERICAN BUILDING SUPPLY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO D DELAWARE CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RETROLOCK CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSSO DENNIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

6/30/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeld-Wen Inc dba American Building Supply a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeld-Wen Inc dba American Building Supply a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeld-Wen Inc dba American Building Supply a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RETROLOCK CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant