This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 01:26:53 (UTC).

JEHANGIR MEHER VS ING NAN YU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 JEHANGIR MEHER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ING NAN YU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JARED D. MOSES and JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0228

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JARED D. MOSES

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEHER JEHANGIR

Defendants

CHANDLER SM LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

YU ING NAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAKE DAVID NATHAN

Defendant Attorney

LONG HELEN GRAYCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/6/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Complaint

4/21/2022: Complaint

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/3/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/3/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6) OF 05/03/2022

5/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6) OF 05/03/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/3/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6)

5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

4/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: CCP 170.6)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: CCP 170.6) of 05/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Jehangir Meher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAKE DAVID NATHAN