This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 04:32:23 (UTC).

JEFFREY SERBER, ET AL. VS BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 JEFFREY SERBER, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4759

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUDAKEN MARK

SERBER JEFFREY

Defendants

BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE

PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. LLC

PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LA

PORSCHE WOODLAND HILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVOODI NATAN

Defendant Attorney

SWEENEY MICHAEL P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/31/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT LAD-P, LLC D/B/A PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/5/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT LAD-P, LLC D/B/A PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer

12/5/2022: Answer

Answer - DEFENDANT PORSCHE WOODLAND HILL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT PORSCHE WOODLAND HILL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

12/13/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

12/27/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Porsche Cars North America, Inc. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jeffrey Serber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beverly Hills Porsche (Defendant); As to: Jeffrey Serber (Plaintiff); Mark Judaken (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: LAD-P, LLC d/b/a PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LA Erroneously Sued As Porsche Downtown LA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Porsche Cars North America, Inc. LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Porsche Cars North America, Inc. to Porsche Cars North America, Inc. LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JEFFREY SERBER (Plaintiff); MARK JUDAKEN (Plaintiff); As to: BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE, a California Corporation, (Defendant); PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company, (Defendant); PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LA, a California Corporation, (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JEFFREY SERBER (Plaintiff); MARK JUDAKEN (Plaintiff); As to: BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE, a California Corporation, (Defendant); PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company, (Defendant); PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LA, a California Corporation, (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JEFFREY SERBER (Plaintiff); MARK JUDAKEN (Plaintiff); As to: BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE, a California Corporation, (Defendant); PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company, (Defendant); PORSCHE DOWNTOWN LA, a California Corporation, (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less