This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 08:41:43 (UTC).

JEFFREY PLATT VS DARREN JOHNSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JEFFREY PLATT against DARREN JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9078

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PLATT JEFFREY

Defendants and Respondents

JOHNSON DARREN

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

DOES 1-100

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/26/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC AND DARREN JOHNSON ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/13/2018: ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC AND DARREN JOHNSON ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/9/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

6/6/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLANT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

6/6/2018: COMPLANT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC AND DARREN JOHNSON ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car (Defendant); Darren Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jeffrey Platt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jeffrey Platt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Other - (Proof Of Service Of Summons); Filed by Jeffrey Platt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jeffrey Platt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • COMPLANT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709078    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JEFFREY PLATT,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

DARREN JOHNSON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC709078

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 16, 2019

1. Background Facts

Plaintiff, Jeffrey Platt filed this action against Defendants, Darren Johnson and Enterprise Rent-A-Car for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff seeks to recover, among other damages, lost earnings and lost profits.

2. Motion for Summary Adjudication

Defendant, Enterprise seeks adjudication of Plaintiff’s claims for “lost earnings” and “lost profits” asserted in his complaint. Defendant contends Plaintiff cannot maintain these claims because the damages sought are speculative.

The motion is denied. CCP §437c(f) permits the Court to adjudicate a claim for punitive damages. When a claim for damages other than punitive damages is at issue, the motion is governed by §437c(t). This section specifies a method for the parties to jointly request a court order permitting them to have the issue adjudicated. The parties to this case did not follow the method set forth in §437c(t), and therefore the Court declines to rule on the merits of the motion.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.