This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 19:54:28 (UTC).

JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED VS SECUREALERT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SECUREALERT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1345

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABED JEFFREY MOHAMED

Defendants

SECUREALERT INC.

TRACK GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MGDESYAN ESQ. GEORGE G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

11/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JEFFREY MOHAMED ABED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MGDESYAN GEORGE G. ESQ.