This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 01:14:00 (UTC).

JEFFREY KEITH BIANCAMANO VS MAVEN TILE & STONE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 JEFFREY KEITH BIANCAMANO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAVEN TILE STONE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0500

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIANCAMANO JEFFREY KEITH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DETAILS TILE & STONE STUDIO LLC

MAVEN TILE & STONE LLC

NISSENSON LIZETT

Cross Defendants

K FAIR LANDSCAPING DESIGN A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

KELSEY FAIR AN INDIVIDUAL DBA K. FAIR LANDSCAPE DESIGN

K. FAIR DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTES ROBERT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SLOAN MICHAEL

Cross Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON S.V. STUART

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/9/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/17/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/17/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/30/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

4/30/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/30/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE CROSS-DEFENDANT K. FAIR LANDSCAPE DESIGN'S NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE CROSS-DEFENDANT K. FAIR LANDSCAPE DESIGN'S NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE

1/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

1/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT MONTES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

1/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT MONTES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT MONTES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

1/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT MONTES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

1/8/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Entire Action of the Cross-Complaint); Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Details Tile & Stone Studio, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Lizett Nissenson (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Details Tile & Stone Studio, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Lizett Nissenson (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Filed by Jeffrey Keith Biancamano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by S.V. Stuart Johnson (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Jeffrey Keith Biancamano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDefendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Michael L. Sloan; Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Errata Regarding Unsigned Page in Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Maven Tile & Stone, LLC (Defendant); Lizett Nissenson (Defendant); Details Tile & Stone Studio, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jeffrey Keith Biancamano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeffrey Keith Biancamano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeffrey Keith Biancamano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON S.V. STUART