This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:18:18 (UTC).

JEFFREY HESTER VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 JEFFREY HESTER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3378

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HESTER JEFFREY

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILAIRE MIKA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF JEFFREY HESTERS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY PROCEEDINGS

3/8/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF JEFFREY HESTERS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/12/2023: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

11/28/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/28/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRYAN HICKEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

11/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRYAN HICKEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LINDA WANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

11/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LINDA WANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

11/28/2022: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

10/12/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOpposition PLAINTIFF JEFFREY HESTERS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY PROCEEDINGS; Filed by: JEFFREY HESTER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 01/12/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/21/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JEFFREY HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JEFFREY HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JEFFREY HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less