This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2019 at 08:20:11 (UTC).

JEFFREY GALLO VS APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 JEFFREY GALLO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0154

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GALLO JEFREY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DRYDEN CHRISTOPHER R. ESQ.

GLOBAL LEGAL LAW FIRM

DRYDEN CHRISTOPHER ROBIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER BARONDESS LLP

HASHMALL JENNIFER MIRA

SYPEK CASEY BLAIR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer - PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT JEFFREY GALLO'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2018: Answer - PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT JEFFREY GALLO'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SHAWNDA R. DORN, CSR #11387

3/26/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SHAWNDA R. DORN, CSR #11387

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR...)

3/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR...)

Reply - REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND MONETARY SANCTI

3/19/2019: Reply - REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND MONETARY SANCTI

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA J. HERNDON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET

3/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA J. HERNDON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES FROM APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST COAST, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET

Separate Statement

3/19/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CASEY B. SYPEK IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CASEY B. SYPEK IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ 13269

3/20/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ 13269

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

3/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

3/20/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

3/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

3/21/2019: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Applied Merchant Systems West Coast, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Requests for Production) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (from Applied Merchant Systems West Coast, LLC to Form Interrogatories) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jefrey Gallo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) BREACH OF WRITTEN EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT; 2) FRAUD IN THE INDUCEMENT; AND 3) ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Jefrey Gallo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jefrey Gallo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jefrey Gallo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL

MIRA HASHMALL (State Bar No. 216842)

mhashmall@milierbarondess.com FILED .

CASEY B. SYPEK (State Bar No. 291214) Superior Court of California

csypek@millerbarondess.com Countv of F.0c Anoeles

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP -

1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1000 MAY 14 2018

Los Angeles, California 90067 . .

Telephone: (310) 552-4400 - - Sherri R. Carfer, Executive Officer/Clerk of Court

Facsimile: (310) 552-8400 Byl N N\ eputy Ran! Qanchenr ’ ’

Attomeys for Defendant e

APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST

COAST, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

JEFFREY GALLO, an individual, CASE NO. BC690154 - (Related to BC687247) Plaintiff, |

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

V. AND CROSS-COMPLAINT APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST Assigned for All Purposes to: COAST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Hon. Mark V. Mooney, Dept. 68

company, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, " Action Filed: January 11, 2018 Defendants. Trial Date: None Set

APPLIED MERCHANT SYSTEMS WEST

COAST, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Cross-Complainant, V.

JEFFREY GALLO, an individual,

Cross-Defendant.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Applied Merchant Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASHMALL JENNIFER MIRA