Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 13:19:40 (UTC).

JEFFREY ERIC BROWN, ET AL. VS JOSE ALVARADO CUEVAS

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 JEFFREY ERIC BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ALVARADO CUEVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6095

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURKE JULIA

BROWN JEFFREY ERIC

Defendant

CUEVAS JOSE ALVARADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALADZHYAN AYKANUSH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF S...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2020

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Hearing09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Enter Default) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Enter Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Enter Default) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Enter Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jeffrey Eric Brown (Plaintiff); Julia Burke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of Summons and Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 09/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jeffrey Eric Brown (Plaintiff); Julia Burke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jeffrey Eric Brown (Plaintiff); Julia Burke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALADZHYAN AYKANUSH HEIDI